Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Manuel Pérez Raygoza

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Suava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1973 Born
13 May 200026.7Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
25 Jan 202046.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
25 Jan 202046.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Suava
19 Mar 202046.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suava

MicroData Summary for Luis Manuel Pérez Raygoza
Bishop Luis Manuel Pérez Raygoza (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2020
  • mn/ln/ob/c2: CB, 25 Jan 2020
  • c34: CB, 19 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast