Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Efraín Tamez Villarreal

Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

Titular Bishop of Madaurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1973 Born
15 Aug 200329.9Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
31 Oct 201643.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
31 Oct 201643.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
11 Jan 201743.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus

MicroData Summary for Oscar Efraín Tamez Villarreal
Bishop Oscar Efraín Tamez Villarreal (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAllende
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Monterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 5 Nov 2016
  • ob: CB, 13 Nov 2016
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,316

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast