Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Viera Contreras

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1907Born
30 May 193124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Colima, México
25 Jul 196760.5AppointedBishop of Colima, México
8 Sep 196760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Colima, México
25 Mar 197265.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México
30 Jun 197265.4InstalledBishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México
7 Jul 197770.4ResignedBishop of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México
2 Dec 197770.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guzmán, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Viera Contreras
Bishop Leonardo Viera Contreras (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Guzmán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuxpan

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018