Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Lara y Torres

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tacámbaro, Michoacán

Titular Bishop of Halicarnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1874BornQuiroga
23 Dec 192046.1AppointedBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
29 Jun 192146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
18 Apr 193358.4ResignedBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
18 Apr 193358.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
30 Nov 193965.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Lara y Torres:
Bishop Leopoldo Lara y Torres (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tacámbaro

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013