Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Rangel Mendoza, O.F.M.

Bishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México

Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1946 Born
19 Dec 197327.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jun 197428.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Mar 200962.8AppointedBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
5 Jun 200963.1Ordained BishopBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
20 Jun 201569.1AppointedBishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa, Guerrero, México
28 Oct 201771.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
9 Jul 201973.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Salvador Rangel Mendoza
Bishop Salvador Rangel Mendoza O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Chilpancingo-Chilapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTepalcatepec
Ordained Bishopesplanade de Reloj Municipal, Huejutla, Diocese of Huejutla, Hidalgo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chilpancingo-Chilapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,183
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2015
  • ab: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast