Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Hiraís Acosta Beltrán

Bishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1966 BornPezmatlán
25 Nov 199226.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
11 Jun 199326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
28 Jan 201649.3AppointedBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
14 Mar 201649.4Ordained BishopBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for José Hiraís Acosta Beltrán
Bishop José Hiraís Acosta Beltrán (born ) Bishop of Huejutla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huejutla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2016
  • od: CB, 28 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 29 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 5 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 16 Mar 2016