Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Díaz y Escudero

Deceased

Bishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1880Born
21 Sep 190323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
4 Nov 192949.1AppointedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
9 Feb 193049.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
4 Mar 193049.4InstalledBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
24 Nov 195575.1DiedBishop of Chilapa, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Díaz y Escudero
Bishop Leopoldo Díaz y Escudero (born , died ) Bishop of Chilapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcozauca

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1930, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 May 2020

Quantcast