Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germán de Ascensión Villalvazo y Rodríguez

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1829Born
15 Aug 185223.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 186940.4AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
5 Dec 186940.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 May 187949.9DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Germán de Ascensión Villalvazo y Rodríguez
Bishop Germán de Ascensión Villalvazo y Rodríguez (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtenguillo, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopS. Jacques des Espagnols, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 200
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017