Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Puigllat y Amigó

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1804Born
1829¹24.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 186257.3SelectedBishop of Lérida, Spain
21 May 186257.7ConfirmedBishop of Lérida, Spain
12 Oct 186258.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
2 Feb 187065.4DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Puigllat y Amigó (VIAF: 304622558)
Bishop Mariano Puigllat y Amigó (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTona, Diocese of Vic
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vic, Diocese of Vic

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 320
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 170, Number 936
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017