Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Luis Jordá y Soler

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1822Born
14 Sep 186543.2SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
8 Jan 186643.5ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
15 Apr 186643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
22 Jun 187250.0DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Luis Jordá y Soler
Bishop Antonio Luis Jordá y Soler (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerona, Diocese of Gerona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lérida, Diocese of Lérida

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 589
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 173, Number 951
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018