Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Baltasar Toledano

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1766Born
1791¹24.9Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
23 May 182458.3SelectedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
12 Jul 182458.4ConfirmedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
3 Oct 182458.7Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
27 May 183064.3DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Baltasar Toledano
Bishop Juan Baltasar Toledano (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Campillo

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 140, Number 759
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018