Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José López y Crespo

Deceased

Bishop of Santander, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1797Born
1822¹24.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 185961.7SelectedBishop of Santander, Spain
26 Sep 185962.0ConfirmedBishop of Santander, Spain
1 Jan 186062.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
21 Mar 187577.5DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José López y Crespo
Bishop José López y Crespo (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro de Cornaedo, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 500
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 168, Number 922
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017