Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimiro Herrero Pérez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1824Born
18 Jun 185228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
1 Oct 188056.5AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
6 Feb 188156.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
12 Nov 188662.6DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Casimiro Herrero Pérez (VIAF: 100826925)
Bishop Casimiro Herrero Pérez O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillameriel, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 165
  • bd: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017