Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leandro Arrúe Agudo, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaro, Philippines

Note/Previous Titular See: (de San Nicolás de Tolentino)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1837Born
22 Sep 186023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
27 Mar 188548.0AppointedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
30 Aug 188548.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaro, Philippines
24 Oct 189760.6DiedBishop of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Leandro Arrúe Agudo
Bishop Leandro Arrúe Agudo O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalatayud, Spain
Ordained BishopAugustins Recollects, Chapel, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017