Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Masot y Gómez, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Hauara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1845Born
1863¹17.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Jun 186923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Jun 188438.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
20 Jun 188438.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hauara
12 Oct 188438.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hauara
17 Mar 191165.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Masot y Gómez
Bishop Salvador Masot y Gómez O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlfés, Spain

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017