Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Fernández, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Miletopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1828¹BornCiaño de Langreo, Spain
25 May 185022.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Mar 186335.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
27 Mar 186335.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
2 Feb 186436.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
19 Jul 186941.5DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Fernández:
Bishop Gaspar Fernández O.P. (died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

  • a priest for 19.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 171, Number 941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015