Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Martí, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

Titular Bishop of Tricomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1811BornMorella, Spain
18 Dec 182716.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Sep 183423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 May 184735.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
18 May 184735.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
29 Jun 184735.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
5 Sep 184837.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
26 Aug 185241.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Domingo Martí:
Bishop Domingo Martí O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 377
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 152, Number 829

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013