Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. José María Díaz Sanjurjo, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Plataea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1818Born
24 Sep 184324.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Mar 184425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Sep 184829.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
5 Sep 184829.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Plataea
8 Apr 184930.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plataea
26 Aug 185233.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
20 Jul 185738.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
29 Apr 1951Beatified
19 Jun 1988Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. José María Díaz Sanjurjo (VIAF: 88786750)
Bishop St. José María Díaz Sanjurjo O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Eulaliae de Suegos, Spain

  • a priest for 13.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 458
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 158, Number 863
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016