Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Gordaliza y Sánchez, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bac Ninh

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1874BornVillafrades de Campos, Spain
8 Dec 189016.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Dec 189319.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Aug 191540.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
10 Aug 191540.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
16 Jan 191641.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
4 Jul 192449.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern Tonking {Tonkino Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
14 Oct 193156.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Bac Ninh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Gordaliza y Sánchez:
Bishop Teodoro Gordaliza y Sánchez O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bac Ninh

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 33
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013