Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Gabriel Guisain, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Laranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1665³BornParis, France
29 Jun 169327.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Dec 171853.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
3 Dec 171853.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
4 May 172155.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
17 Nov 172358.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Gabriel Guisain:
Bishop François-Gabriel Guisain M.E.P. (born Jul 1665, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015