Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Odoardo Cibo (Cybo)

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1619BornMassa, Italy
28 Jul 167050.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
11 Aug 167050.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
1679²59.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
13 Oct 168969.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
6 Apr 170585.3DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Odoardo Cibo (Cybo) (VIAF: 309706199)
Patriarch Odoardo Cibo (Cybo) (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 170, and Page 352
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 43
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Nov 2016