Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Berardino Corradini

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635¹Born
27 May 168045.4AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
2 Jun 168045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
26 Dec 171883.9DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Berardino Corradini
Bishop Francesco Berardino Corradini (born 1635, died ) Bishop of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFabriano

  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast