Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Urbano Cardinal Sacchetti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640BornFlorence
1 Sep 168141.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168141.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
29 Mar 168343.2AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
2 May 168343.3Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
28 Nov 168949.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
22 Dec 169354.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
24 Jan 170161.1ResignedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
14 Jan 170464.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
6 Apr 170565.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Urbano Sacchetti:
Cardinal Urbano Sacchetti (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
  • a cardinal for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013