Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Didacus Álvares

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cranganore (Angamala)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1654³BornLisboa, Portugal
15 Dec 169339.3SelectedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
19 Apr 169439.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
2 May 169439.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
30 Dec 169743.4ResignedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
8 Nov 171359.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cranganore (Angamala), India
19 Dec 171359.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Didacus Álvares:
Archbishop Didacus Álvares (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cranganore (Angamala)

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 175
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015