Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques de Bourges, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Auzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹Born
27 Nov 167945.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
27 Nov 167945.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
17 May 168248.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
9 Aug 171480.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Bourges
Bishop Jacques de Bourges M.E.P. (born 1634, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, France

  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017