Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Deydier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1634Born
Nov 1660³26.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
25 Nov 167844.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
25 Nov 167844.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
21 Dec 168248.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
1 Jul 169358.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Deydier (VIAF: 61535960)
Bishop François Deydier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulon, Diocese of Toulon, France

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017