Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Laneau, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Siam

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1637BornMondonbleau, France
4 Jul 166932.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
4 Jul 166932.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
25 Mar 167436.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
16 Mar 169658.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Louis Laneau:
Bishop Louis Laneau M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Siam

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015