Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Mahot, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Bida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornArgentan, France
29 Jan 168050.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
29 Jan 168050.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
25 Oct 168252.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
4 Jun 168454.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Mahot:
Bishop Guillaume Mahot M.E.P. (born 1630, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015