Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Perez

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Bugia


Events

DateEventTitle
1668²Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 1687AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
5 Feb 1687AppointedTitular Bishop of Bugia
29 Jul 1691Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bugia
20 Sep 1728DiedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Perez:
Bishop François Perez (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 129
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015