Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre de Alexandris, B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Nabala


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1725AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
22 Dec 1725AppointedTitular Bishop of Nabala
1726Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nabala
20 Sep 1728SucceededVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
10 Oct 1738DiedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Alexandre de Alexandris:
Bishop Alexandre de Alexandris B. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013