Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie-Pélagie Havard, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1790BornThourie, France
16 Jun 182130.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Mar 182837.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
21 Mar 182837.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
21 Sep 182938.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
8 Feb 183140.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
5 Jul 183847.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Pélagie Havard:
Bishop Joseph-Marie-Pélagie Havard M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 17.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013