Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father St. Pierre-Rose-Ursule Dumoulin-Borie, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Achantus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1808BornCors, France
21 Nov 183022.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
30 Jan 183627.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
30 Jan 183627.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Achantus
24 Nov 183830.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
27 May 1900Beatified
19 Jun 1988Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Pierre-Rose-Ursule Dumoulin-Borie:
Priest St. Pierre-Rose-Ursule Dumoulin-Borie M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013