Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand Reydellet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Gabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1722BornLe Grand-Abergement, France
21 Dec 174826.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Jul 176240.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
27 Jul 176240.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabala
19 Oct 176442.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
15 Dec 176543.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabala
27 Jul 178058.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Bertrand Reydellet:
Bishop Bertrand Reydellet M.E.P. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015