Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Obellar, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Ruspae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1734BornDonado, Spain
18 May 175823.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
29 Jan 177843.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
29 Jan 177843.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
2 May 177944.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
7 Sep 178954.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Manuel Obellar:
Bishop Manuel Obellar O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 95, Number 490
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015