Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliciano Alonso, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Fesseë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1732²BornSoto de Valdeón, Spain
1 Oct 179058.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
1 Oct 179058.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
10 Mar 179361.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
2 Feb 179967.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Feliciano Alonso:
Bishop Feliciano Alonso O.P. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 110, Number 574

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015