Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo Lezzoli, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Olena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655¹BornMilan, Italy
20 Oct 169641.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
20 Oct 169641.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
2 Feb 170247.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
18 Jan 170651.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Lezzoli:
Bishop Raimondo Lezzoli O.P. (born 1655, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015