Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilario a Jesu Costa, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1696BornPessinetto, Italy
3 Oct 173539.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
3 Oct 173539.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
11 Nov 173640.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
8 Apr 173740.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
31 Mar 175457.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Hilario a Jesu Costa:
Bishop Hilario a Jesu Costa O.A.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 55, Number 239
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015