Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Domingo Henares, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Fesseë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1765Born
30 Aug 178317.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Sep 179024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Sep 180034.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
9 Sep 180034.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
9 Jan 180337.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
25 Jun 183872.5DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
27 May 1900Beatified
19 Jun 1988Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Domingo Henares
Bishop St. Domingo Henares O.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaena, Spain

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 122, Number 649

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast