Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Claude-François de Reymond, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

Titular Bishop of Cinna

Titular See: (died before consecration)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1720¹Born
1747²27.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 Feb 175636.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
11 Feb 175636.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cinna
19 Mar 175636.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-François de Reymond
Father Claude-François de Reymond M.E.P. (born 1720, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Claude, France
Death PlaceMacau

  • a priest for 9.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,756
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 165, and Page 455
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast