Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Ten Gan-lin (Deng Ji-zhou)

Deceased

Bishop of Leshan [Kiating], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1905Born
9 Feb 193630.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 194943.5AppointedBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China
21 Sep 194943.8Ordained BishopBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China
10 Aug 199084.7DiedBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Ten Gan-lin (Deng Ji-zhou)
Bishop Paul Ten Gan-lin (Deng Ji-zhou) (born , died ) Bishop of Leshan [Kiating]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTsitwiwa
Ordained BishopChungking, Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 81
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast