Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop John Cai Ti-yuan (Tsai Tai-Yuen)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Shantou [Swatow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1920¹Born
1949¹29.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 198161.7Ordained BishopBishop of Shantou [Swatow], China
24 Nov 199777.8DiedBishop of Shantou [Swatow], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Cai Ti-yuan (Tsai Tai-Yuen)
Bishop John Cai Ti-yuan (Tsai Tai-Yuen) (born 1920, died ) Bishop of Shantou [Swatow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Canton, Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
Death PlaceSwatow, Diocese of Shantou [Swatow]

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,091
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast