Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop James Ping Leung Lin (Lin Binglian)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1913Born
14 Sep 194128.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 199076.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China
25 May 200187.9DiedBishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China

MicroData Summary for James Ping Leung Lin (Lin Binglian)
Bishop James Ping Leung Lin (Lin Binglian) (born , died ) Bishop of Guangzhou [Canton]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanton, Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
Death PlaceCanton, Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast