Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis Florens, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan)

Titular Bishop of Zela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1756BornLagnes, France
177821.7ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
2 Oct 180751.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China
2 Oct 180751.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
29 Jun 181054.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
14 Dec 181458.7DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan), China

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Florens:
Bishop Jean-Louis Florens M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan)

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 402

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013