Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathew Chen Muchen (Chen Mushun)

Deceased

Bishop of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1902Born
17 Mar 193532.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 198885.3Ordained BishopBishop of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China
9 Apr 199794.3DiedBishop of Zhaotong [Chaotung], China

MicroData Summary for Mathew Chen Muchen (Chen Mushun)
Bishop Mathew Chen Muchen (Chen Mushun) (born , died ) Bishop of Zhaotong [Chaotung]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYliang
Ordained BishopChungking, Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,109
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 24 Dec 2019

Quantcast