Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Michael Xie Chaogang] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1910Born
29 Sep 193626.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 199181.1Ordained BishopBishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China
2 Jan 199988.8DiedBishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China

MicroData Summary for Michael Xie Chaogang
Bishop Michael Xie Chaogang (born , died ) Bishop of Xichang [Ningyüan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiangshan
Ordained BishopBeijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast