Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hou Guoyong (Guoyang)

Deceased

Bishop of Chongqing [Chungking], China

Note(s): (validity uncertain, unclear if living)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1922²Born
1951²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Oct 198967.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chongqing [Chungking], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hou Guoyong (Guoyang)
(WikiData: Q105192283)
Bishop Joseph Hou Guoyong (Guoyang) (born 1922) Bishop of Chongqing [Chungking]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBishop's residence, Baodung, Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 56
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,722
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,474
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,977
  • b: CB, 29 Jul 2022
  • ob?: CB, 17 Aug 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024