Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jules Elmire Douénel, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Sikkim, India

Priest of La Société des Missions Etrangères


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1866Born
3 Jul 189225.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Feb 192962.4AppointedSuperior of Sikkim, India
16 Jun 193164.7AppointedPrefect of Sikkim, India
8 Apr 193770.5ResignedPrefect of Sikkim, India
1 Feb 194073.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Sikkim, India

MicroData Summary for Jules Elmire Douénel
Father Jules Elmire Douénel M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Sikkim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint, France

  • a priest for 47.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018