Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert Nègre

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1853Born
20 Apr 187825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mende, France
14 Jul 190855.4AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
23 Aug 190855.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
5 Aug 191360.4AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
5 Feb 193177.9DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Albert Nègre
Archbishop Albert Nègre (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Bonnet-de-Chirac

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018