Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène-Louis-Marie Le Fer de la Motte

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1867Born
23 May 189123.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 191446.5AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
5 Nov 191446.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
8 Jul 193567.6ResignedBishop of Nantes, France
8 Jul 193567.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
20 Jul 193668.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Louis-Marie Le Fer de la Motte
Bishop Eugène-Louis-Marie Le Fer de la Motte (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Servan

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018