Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Butler, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Milopotamos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1830Born
1872²41.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
31 May 187847.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
31 May 187847.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
25 Aug 187847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milopotamos
25 Oct 190171.1DiedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Butler
Bishop Anthony Butler S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of British Guiana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalway, Diocese of Galway, Ireland
Ordained BishopGeorgetown, Vicariate Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 378
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018